TN HB1022 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a current early service retiree from changing to disability retirement; makes other revisions to provisions governing the Tennessee consolidated retirement system. - Amends TCA Section 8-25-204; Section 8-25-205; Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.
Title
As enacted, prohibits a current early service retiree from changing to disability retirement; makes other revisions to provisions governing the Tennessee consolidated retirement system. - Amends TCA Section 8-25-204; Section 8-25-205; Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 381 | |
2019-04-30 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-23 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/19 |
2019-04-22 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2019-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0633 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 381