TN HB1087 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 446
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 446
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, replaces the awarding of treble damages under the Public Employee Political Freedom Act of 1980 with the awarding of compensatory damages. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21 and Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 6.
Title
As enacted, replaces the awarding of treble damages under the Public Employee Political Freedom Act of 1980 with the awarding of compensatory damages. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21 and Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 446 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/22/2019 | |
2019-05-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-15 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0401) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0123) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 63, Nays 27, PNV 2 |
2019-04-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0247) |
2019-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0569 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 446