TN HB1111 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the minority party to appoint members of the state executive committee by rules of the party rather than at the regular August primary election. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 13.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the minority party to appoint members of the state executive committee by rules of the party rather than at the regular August primary election. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Powell [D] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] |
Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. Bo Mitchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0882 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee