TN HB1154 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds the word "valor" to the Silver Star specialty license plate. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, adds the word "valor" to the Silver Star specialty license plate. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] |
Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Dave Wright [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] |
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. John Windle [D] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] |
Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] |
Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Harold Love [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Pub. Ch. 171 | |
2019-04-24 | Effective date(s) 04/18/2019 | |
2019-04-18 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0180) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-07 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-07 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0009) |
2019-02-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0639 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 171