TN HB1163 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 308
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 308
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires travel promoters to use trust accounts to avoid commingling their funds with customer funds that are held for disbursement for payment of travel services. - Amends TCA Title 47 and Title 62.
Title
As enacted, requires travel promoters to use trust accounts to avoid commingling their funds with customer funds that are held for disbursement for payment of travel services. - Amends TCA Title 47 and Title 62.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 308 | |
2019-04-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-15 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-08 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/15/19 |
2019-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-25 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Consumer Subcommittee to 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0634 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Pub. Ch. 308