TN HB1168 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 360
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 360
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates offenses related to the possession, sale, distribution, and transport of child-like sex dolls. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As enacted, creates offenses related to the possession, sale, distribution, and transport of child-like sex dolls. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 360 | |
2019-04-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0659 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 360