TN HB1184 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the removal of pregnant prisoners to a state penitentiary or branch prison for safekeeping; prohibits solitary confinement of pregnant prisoners. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the removal of pregnant prisoners to a state penitentiary or branch prison for safekeeping; prohibits solitary confinement of pregnant prisoners. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.
Sponsors
Rep. Jesse Chism [D] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] | Sen. London Lamar [D] |
Rep. Gloria Johnson [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Corrections Subcommittee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0958 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee