TN HB1216 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner to conduct a study of programs to integrate persons formerly incarcerated into the workforce and community. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner to conduct a study of programs to integrate persons formerly incarcerated into the workforce and community. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1026 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee