TN HB1264 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 479
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates a concealed handgun carry permit, which allows a person to carry a concealed handgun; redesignates the existing handgun carry permit as an enhanced handgun carry permit. - Amends TCA Title 10; Title 33; Title 38 and Title 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates a concealed handgun carry permit, which allows a person to carry a concealed handgun; redesignates the existing handgun carry permit as an enhanced handgun carry permit. - Amends TCA Title 10; Title 33; Title 38 and Title 39.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 62 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Pub. Ch. 479
2019-05-29 Effective date(s) 01/01/2020
2019-05-24 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-17HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-14SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-10HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-09HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-05-02SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 18, Nays 11, PNV 2
2019-05-02SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0126)
2019-05-02SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA0464)
2019-05-02SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0463)
2019-05-02SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-05-01SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-30HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-30HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 62, Nays 31, PNV 1
2019-04-30HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0021)
2019-04-30HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA0499)
2019-04-30HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0490)
2019-04-30HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0489)
2019-04-29HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced behind the budget
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-27HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-02-27HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 2/27/2019
2019-02-20HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0705 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 479

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1264&ga=111
Texthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HB1264.pdf
Texthttp://publications.tnsosfiles.com/acts/111/pub/pc0479.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0021.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0489.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0490.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0499.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/SB0705.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM0238.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM0302.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM1418.pdf
Roll Callhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1264&ga=111

Bill Comments

feedback