TN HB1280 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 481
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 481
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, directs the governor, through the commissioner of finance and administration, to submit a waiver amendment to the centers for medicare and medicaid services to provide TennCare II funding by means of a block grant indexed for inflation and population growth. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, directs the governor, through the commissioner of finance and administration, to submit a waiver amendment to the centers for medicare and medicaid services to provide TennCare II funding by means of a block grant indexed for inflation and population growth. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 2 MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 63 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY STEWART PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 2 MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 63 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY STEWART PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 481 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/24/2019 | |
2019-05-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-09 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, Ayes 26, Nays 6 |
2019-05-02 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 63, Nays 19 PNV 1 |
2019-05-02 | House | Conf. comm. appointed. (T. Hill, Howell, Zachary) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed. (Bailey, Yarbro, Watson, Bell, Robinson) |
2019-05-02 | House | Conf. comm. appointed. ( T.Hill, C.Sexton, Smith, Crawford, Hakeem) |
2019-05-02 | House | H. refused to recede from its non-concurrence |
2019-05-02 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 5/2/19 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from amendment 1 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-30 | House | H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 1 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 24, Nays 5 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0358) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-11 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 68, Nays 21, PNV 1 |
2019-04-11 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0032) |
2019-04-11 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 2 - HA0294) |
2019-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1428 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 481