TN HB1281 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits the utility management review board to authorize the voluntary sale of all or part of the assets of a utility district to a public utility if certain conditions are met. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 82, Part 7 and Section 65-4-101.
Title
As introduced, permits the utility management review board to authorize the voluntary sale of all or part of the assets of a utility district to a public utility if certain conditions are met. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 82, Part 7 and Section 65-4-101.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Commerce Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Utilities Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Utilities Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1414 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee