TN HB1295 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the domestic violence coordinating council, in coordination with the administrative office of the courts, to revise the affidavit of firearms dispossession form to require only a signature from a defendant convicted of domestic violence. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-111.
Title
As introduced, requires the domestic violence coordinating council, in coordination with the administrative office of the courts, to revise the affidavit of firearms dispossession form to require only a signature from a defendant convicted of domestic violence. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-111.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-02 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 82, Nays 11, PNV 0 |
2019-04-01 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0132) |
2019-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Action def. in Judiciary to 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1341 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-26 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0