TN HB1313 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Investments Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Investments Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes state treasurer to make deposits to facilitate the bank local community deposit program. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 45.
Title
As introduced, authorizes state treasurer to make deposits to facilitate the bank local community deposit program. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 45.
Sponsors
Rep. John Windle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Investments Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee-- Government Operations Review |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0769 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2020