TN HB1427 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires, when neither the seller nor purchaser of a firearm is a licensed gun dealer that the transaction be completed through a licensed gun dealer, and that the dealer perform the same background check required for purchases from licensed gun dealers. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires, when neither the seller nor purchaser of a firearm is a licensed gun dealer that the transaction be completed through a licensed gun dealer, and that the dealer perform the same background check required for purchases from licensed gun dealers. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-28 | House | Reassigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1010 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee