TN HB1432 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Failed for lack of second in: Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Failed for lack of second in: Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each county election commission, no later than January 1, 2020, to utilize precinct-based optical scanners for elections. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 20.
Title
As introduced, requires each county election commission, no later than January 1, 2020, to utilize precinct-based optical scanners for elections. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 20.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Failed for lack of second in: Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1012 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee