TN HB1450 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - Failed in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - Failed in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the chief procurement officer to submit the annual report on the awarding of purchases to a minority-owned business, woman-owned business, service-disabled veteran-owned business, business owned by persons with disabilities, or small business to the general assembly in electronic format. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7, Chapter 4; Title 8, Chapter 37, Part 1; Title 12; Title 13, Chapter 29; Section 39-14-137; Title 49; Section 62-43-105 and Title 65, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the chief procurement officer to submit the annual report on the awarding of purchases to a minority-owned business, woman-owned business, service-disabled veteran-owned business, business owned by persons with disabilities, or small business to the general assembly in electronic format. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7, Chapter 4; Title 8, Chapter 37, Part 1; Title 12; Title 13, Chapter 29; Section 39-14-137; Title 49; Section 62-43-105 and Title 65, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | Failed in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-28 | House | Reassigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2020-01-15 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-01-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 1/15/2020 |
2019-04-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2020 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0675 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-02 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020