TN HB1544 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates Emancipation Day, August 8 each year, as a state legal holiday. - Amends TCA Title 15.
Title
As introduced, designates Emancipation Day, August 8 each year, as a state legal holiday. - Amends TCA Title 15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-03-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-03-02 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 99, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0535) |
2020-02-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/27/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-28 | House | Action def. in Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee to 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-22 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 1/28/2020 |
2020-01-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-07-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1831 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee