TN HB1546 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Create a Respectful and Open Workplace for Natural Hair (CROWN) Act," which defines race and protective hairstyle for purposes of the Tennessee Human Rights Act. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21; Title 8; Title 49 and Title 50.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Create a Respectful and Open Workplace for Natural Hair (CROWN) Act," which defines race and protective hairstyle for purposes of the Tennessee Human Rights Act. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21; Title 8; Title 49 and Title 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee |
2020-01-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-07-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1832 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee