TN HB1548 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on August 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Re-ref. Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Re-ref. Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates the month of April as "Health and Beauty Month." - Amends TCA Title 15, Chapter 2.
Title
As introduced, designates the month of April as "Health and Beauty Month." - Amends TCA Title 15, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] | Rep. Mike Stewart [D] | Rep. Jesse Chism [D] |
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 34 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | Re-ref. Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-11 | House | Failed to pass H., Ayes 44, Nays 4, PNV 35 |
2020-06-11 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0557) |
2020-06-08 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2020-06-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-05-29 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 6/5/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/29/2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Action def. in Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee to 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Action def. in Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee to 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 2/11/2020 |
2020-01-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-08-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1835 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.