TN HB1552 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a sales and use tax rebate of up to $2,500 for certain homeowners who make eligible purchases of appliances, fixtures, and materials to improve disability accessibility in the homeowner's principal residence. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As introduced, establishes a sales and use tax rebate of up to $2,500 for certain homeowners who make eligible purchases of appliances, fixtures, and materials to improve disability accessibility in the homeowner's principal residence. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-01-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-10-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1717 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Refer to Senate F,W&M Committee w/ negative recommendation