TN HB1607 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 6/10/2020
Pending: House Cities & Counties Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 6/10/2020
Pending: House Cities & Counties Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes prohibition on a member of a local governing body who is also an employee of the local governing body from voting on matters in which the member has a conflict of interest, and reinstates the declaration of conflict prior to voting. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 12.
Title
As introduced, removes prohibition on a member of a local governing body who is also an employee of the local governing body from voting on matters in which the member has a conflict of interest, and reinstates the declaration of conflict prior to voting. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 12.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
Rep. Martin Daniel [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
Rep. Dave Wright [R] | Rep. Justin Lafferty [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] |
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Bill Dunn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2020-01-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1614 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-09 - Deferred to Summer Study