TN HB1626 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, designates as a legal holiday June 19 each year as Juneteenth Day. - Amends TCA Title 15.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, designates as a legal holiday June 19 each year as Juneteenth Day. - Amends TCA Title 15.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-15HouseReset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-06-15HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/15/2020
2020-06-15HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-06-11HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020
2020-06-11HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020
2020-06-10HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-06-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020
2020-06-03HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/10/2020
2020-05-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020
2020-03-18HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020
2020-03-11HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2020-03-03HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-02-26HousePlaced on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 3/3/2020
2020-01-16HouseP2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
2020-01-15HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-01-14HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1829 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback