TN HB1674 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires county election commissions to designate public institutions of higher education with 8,000 or more enrolled students as polling places during early voting in federal and state general elections and presidential primaries for a period of at least five days. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 3, Part 1 and Title 2, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, requires county election commissions to designate public institutions of higher education with 8,000 or more enrolled students as polling places during early voting in federal and state general elections and presidential primaries for a period of at least five days. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 3, Part 1 and Title 2, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2020-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2710 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee