TN HB1749 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Medical Cannabis Act"; establishes medical cannabis commission for regulation of cannabis-related health care. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 50; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Medical Cannabis Act"; establishes medical cannabis commission for regulation of cannabis-related health care. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 50; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Beth Harwell [R] |
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] |
Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Health Committee (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 4/10/2018 |
2018-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Health Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-01-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee-- Health-- Government Operations for Review |
2018-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-22 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1710 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee