TN HB1815 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates an offense of using force or coercion to cause a person to join a criminal gang against the person's will; sets penalty based on the age of the victim. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, creates an offense of using force or coercion to cause a person to join a criminal gang against the person's will; sets penalty based on the age of the victim. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-05-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 5/26/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2042 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee