TN HB1822 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 789
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 789
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions relative to public assistance. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 1, Part 1; Section 71-3-104; Section 71-3-105; Section 71-5-314 and Section 71-5-316.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions relative to public assistance. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 1, Part 1; Section 71-3-104; Section 71-3-105; Section 71-5-314 and Section 71-5-316.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Sherry Jones [D] |
Rep. JoAnne Favors [D] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
Rep. Craig Fitzhugh [D] | Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 789 | |
2018-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-20 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2018-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2247 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 789