TN HB1822 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes LEAs serving any of the grades three through 12 to offer advanced mathematics courses; requires an LEA that offers advanced mathematics courses to place students achieving a benchmark score as determined by the state board of education on the end-of-grade or end-of-course test in mathematics in an advanced course for the next mathematics course in which the student will enroll; adds other requirements concerning advanced mathematics courses. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, authorizes LEAs serving any of the grades three through 12 to offer advanced mathematics courses; requires an LEA that offers advanced mathematics courses to place students achieving a benchmark score as determined by the state board of education on the end-of-grade or end-of-course test in mathematics in an advanced course for the next mathematics course in which the student will enroll; adds other requirements concerning advanced mathematics courses. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent Dixie [D] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. Mike Stewart [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 51 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 51 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-01 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-01 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0570) |
2020-05-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/2020 |
2020-03-20 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 6-1-20 |
2020-03-18 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 3-20-20 |
2020-03-16 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 2/11/2020 |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2020-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-01-23 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2578 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020