TN HB1831 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Failed in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Failed in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a law enforcement agency in Davidson County to purchase law enforcement recording devices for use by on-duty officers by February 10, 2021; creates a Class C felony of a law enforcement officer operating a law enforcement recording device in a manner that violates policies established by the agency issuing the device; creates a Class C felony of a law enforcement officer altering, destroying, or concealing any recording from a law enforcement recording device. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 38, Chapter 1 and Title 39, Chapter 16.
Title
As introduced, requires a law enforcement agency in Davidson County to purchase law enforcement recording devices for use by on-duty officers by February 10, 2021; creates a Class C felony of a law enforcement officer operating a law enforcement recording device in a manner that violates policies established by the agency issuing the device; creates a Class C felony of a law enforcement officer altering, destroying, or concealing any recording from a law enforcement recording device. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 38, Chapter 1 and Title 39, Chapter 16.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Failed in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2020-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee-- Judiciary |
2020-01-23 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1802 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-27 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee