TN HB1881 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires local governments to report, no later than February 1, 2021, to the general assembly the number of business licenses issued to places of accommodation for transients for calendar year 2020. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requires local governments to report, no later than February 1, 2021, to the general assembly the number of business licenses issued to places of accommodation for transients for calendar year 2020. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1931 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee