TN HB1901 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Failed for lack of second in: Corrections Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Failed for lack of second in: Corrections Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires screening of inmates for chemical dependency, mental illness, and serious emotional disturbance; requires the department of correction to contract with certain departments for psychological services; requires inmates to be evaluated for the presence of a learning disability and provided learning disability intervention services as needed. - Amends TCA Title 41.
Title
As introduced, requires screening of inmates for chemical dependency, mental illness, and serious emotional disturbance; requires the department of correction to contract with certain departments for psychological services; requires inmates to be evaluated for the presence of a learning disability and provided learning disability intervention services as needed. - Amends TCA Title 41.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Failed for lack of second in: Corrections Subcommittee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1899 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee