TN HB1972 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes issuance of a disabled veteran plate to veterans who have a service-connected disability that is not a permanent total disability. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, authorizes issuance of a disabled veteran plate to veterans who have a service-connected disability that is not a permanent total disability. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1906 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee