TN HB1978 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Permit Freedom Act," which requires local governmental entities to make final determinations and provide certain information with regard to forms of permission required to engage in constitutionally protected activities within certain time frames; creates cause of action for applicants. - Amends TCA Title 1; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 38; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Permit Freedom Act," which requires local governmental entities to make final determinations and provide certain information with regard to forms of permission required to engage in constitutionally protected activities within certain time frames; creates cause of action for applicants. - Amends TCA Title 1; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 38; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee to 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 2/19/2020 |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1993 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee