TN HB2024 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides paid family and medical leave for state employees and teachers. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 8 and Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 7.
Title
As introduced, provides paid family and medical leave for state employees and teachers. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 8 and Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2020-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2020-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1786 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee