TN HB2131 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 800
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 800
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates the Tennessee state museum located at 1000 Rosa L. Parks Boulevard as the "Bill Haslam Center". - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 12.
Title
As enacted, designates the Tennessee state museum located at 1000 Rosa L. Parks Boulevard as the "Bill Haslam Center". - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 12.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
Rep. Gary Hicks [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] | Rep. Michael Curcio [R] |
Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. Bill Dunn [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
Rep. Dave Wright [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 800 | |
2020-06-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-06-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2301 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 800