TN HB2134 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 60-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Teacher's Discipline Act"; establishes a disciplinary process for students who have been removed from the classroom by the teacher. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Teacher's Discipline Act"; establishes a disciplinary process for students who have been removed from the classroom by the teacher. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-03 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-03 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0754) |
2020-05-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/29/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2252 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020