TN HB2229 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes various requirements relating to literacy instruction provided to students in any of the grades kindergarten through two; establishes methods of evaluating the reading proficiency of students in any of the grades kindergarten through three; establishes requirements relating to literacy instruction provided to teaching candidates; establishes various studies and review processes relating to the state's accountability model and the licensure process for teachers. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, establishes various requirements relating to literacy instruction provided to students in any of the grades kindergarten through two; establishes methods of evaluating the reading proficiency of students in any of the grades kindergarten through three; establishes requirements relating to literacy instruction provided to teaching candidates; establishes various studies and review processes relating to the state's accountability model and the licensure process for teachers. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
Rep. Justin Lafferty [R] | Rep. Bill Dunn [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] |
Rep. Johnny Garrett [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] |
Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Matthew Hill [R] | Rep. Iris Rudder [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] |
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] |
Rep. Charlie Baum [R] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-06-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-06-04 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-02 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2160 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee