TN HB2248 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires county clerks to remit to the commissioner, instead of commissioner or commissioner's designee, the remaining $5.50 of the $10.00 issuance fee received by county clerks for issuing temporary operation permits; authorizes commissioner's designee to issue temporary trailer permits. - Amends TCA Section 55-4-115.
Title
As introduced, requires county clerks to remit to the commissioner, instead of commissioner or commissioner's designee, the remaining $5.50 of the $10.00 issuance fee received by county clerks for issuing temporary operation permits; authorizes commissioner's designee to issue temporary trailer permits. - Amends TCA Section 55-4-115.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/16/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/16/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-06-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-06-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on Safety & Funding Subcommittee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2179 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.