TN HB2263 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 764
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 764
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates the Class C felony of performing or inducing, or attempting to perform or induce, an abortion upon a pregnant woman whose unborn child has a fetal heartbeat; creates other criminal offenses related to the performance of an abortion; requires that certain information regarding reversing chemical abortions be provided; revises and enacts other abortion-related provisions. - Amends TCA Section 37-10-304 and Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, creates the Class C felony of performing or inducing, or attempting to perform or induce, an abortion upon a pregnant woman whose unborn child has a fetal heartbeat; creates other criminal offenses related to the performance of an abortion; requires that certain information regarding reversing chemical abortions be provided; revises and enacts other abortion-related provisions. - Amends TCA Section 37-10-304 and Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 3 (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 3 (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Pub. Ch. 764 | |
2020-07-22 | Effective date(s) 10/01/2020 | |
2020-07-13 | Signed by Governor. | |
2020-07-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-06-19 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 3 Ayes 70, Nays 20, PNV 1 |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 23, Nays 5 |
2020-06-19 | Senate | S. Amendment #1 withdrawn. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment #3 |
2020-06-19 | Senate | S. Amendment #2 withdrawn. |
2020-06-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 69, Nays 17, PNV 2 |
2020-06-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0947) |
2020-06-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0905) |
2020-06-18 | House | Am. reconsidered. (Amendment 1 - HA0905) |
2020-06-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0912) |
2020-06-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0905) |
2020-06-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Health Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee |
2020-02-25 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2196 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 764