TN HB2301 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 34-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a statutory mechanism for automatic adjustments to the current excise tax rate of 6.5 percent based on economic conditions. - Amends TCA Section 9-4-5202 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20.
Title
As introduced, establishes a statutory mechanism for automatic adjustments to the current excise tax rate of 6.5 percent based on economic conditions. - Amends TCA Section 9-4-5202 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2686 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-25 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation