TN HB2312 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that wireless communication includes text messages sent and received on smart devices for purposes of the Anti-Phishing Act of 2006. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 47, Chapter 18.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that wireless communication includes text messages sent and received on smart devices for purposes of the Anti-Phishing Act of 2006. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 47, Chapter 18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2020-05-29 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 6/1/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/29/2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/9/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2212 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.