TN HB2347 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Failed in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Failed in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that it is an offense for a person to purchase or possess a firearm in this state if the person has been prohibited from purchasing or possessing under the laws of another state and not just Tennessee law or federal law. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that it is an offense for a person to purchase or possess a firearm in this state if the person has been prohibited from purchasing or possessing under the laws of another state and not just Tennessee law or federal law. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - HOUSE CONSTITUTIONAL PROTECTIONS & SENTENCING SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Failed in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2240 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee