TN HB2457 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-02 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-02 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Firefighter Suicide Prevention Act." - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 2; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 68, Chapter 102.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Firefighter Suicide Prevention Act." - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 2; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 68, Chapter 102.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2524 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee