TN HB2461 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 708
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 708
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates a procedure for school teachers, school officials, and other school personnel to follow in regard to reporting suspected child abuse or child sexual abuse. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, creates a procedure for school teachers, school officials, and other school personnel to follow in regard to reporting suspected child abuse or child sexual abuse. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 708 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 08/01/2020 | |
2020-06-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2020-06-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-12 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0616) |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-03 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-03 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0751) |
2020-05-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/29/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action def. in Education Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2088 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 708