TN HB2560 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 714
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 714
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that the ability of a next of kin to seek reconsideration of a medical examiner's manner of death determination applies only when the manner of death is determined to be suicide; specifies that unrelated parties have no liability for relying on the original death certificate, without regard to subsequent revision made pursuant to a request for reconsideration of the cause of death. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that the ability of a next of kin to seek reconsideration of a medical examiner's manner of death determination applies only when the manner of death is determined to be suicide; specifies that unrelated parties have no liability for relying on the original death certificate, without regard to subsequent revision made pursuant to a request for reconsideration of the cause of death. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 714 | |
2018-03-19 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1757 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 714