TN HB2571 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts the retail sale of fresh, frozen, and canned vegetables for human consumption from the sales tax. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-228.
Title
As introduced, exempts the retail sale of fresh, frozen, and canned vegetables for human consumption from the sales tax. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-228.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2421 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee