TN HB2644 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires county election commissions to call and send text messages and email notifications to voters whose registration may be purged as a result of the address verification program, with instruction on how the voters may verify or correct their address information. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2.
Title
As introduced, requires county election commissions to call and send text messages and email notifications to voters whose registration may be purged as a result of the address verification program, with instruction on how the voters may verify or correct their address information. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2575 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee