TN HB2683 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from 21 to 14 days the period within which the governing body of the Tennessee Professional Firefighters Association may submit to the governor a list of nominees to fill a vacancy on the commission on firefighting personnel standards and education following notice of a vacancy or pending vacancy, or written objection by the governor to a previously submitted list of nominees. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 24.
Title
As introduced, reduces from 21 to 14 days the period within which the governing body of the Tennessee Professional Firefighters Association may submit to the governor a list of nominees to fill a vacancy on the commission on firefighting personnel standards and education following notice of a vacancy or pending vacancy, or written objection by the governor to a previously submitted list of nominees. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 24.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2765 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee