TN HB2710 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 57
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 57
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, increases, from 5 percent to 8 percent, the tax on the privilege of occupancy of hotels and motels; alters the allocation of revenue raised from the privilege tax. - Amends Chapter 167 of the Private Acts of 1979; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, increases, from 5 percent to 8 percent, the tax on the privilege of occupancy of hotels and motels; alters the allocation of revenue raised from the privilege tax. - Amends Chapter 167 of the Private Acts of 1979; as amended.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 57 | |
2018-04-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-03-15 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2746 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pr. Ch. 57