TN HB2715 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, limits the duration or exclusive contracts to 25 years instead of 50 years; clarifies procedure for removing a city commissioner; removes requirement for commission to adopt a pay plan for city employees; increases the purchasing limit, from $5,000 to $10,000, that does not require a public bid; updates references to Tennessee Code Annotated; makes other various revisions. - Amends Chapter 510 of the Private Acts of 1919; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, limits the duration or exclusive contracts to 25 years instead of 50 years; clarifies procedure for removing a city commissioner; removes requirement for commission to adopt a pay plan for city employees; increases the purchasing limit, from $5,000 to $10,000, that does not require a public bid; updates references to Tennessee Code Annotated; makes other various revisions. - Amends Chapter 510 of the Private Acts of 1919; as amended.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 56 | |
2018-04-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-03-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-03-19 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2742 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pr. Ch. 56