TN HB2717 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes department of revenue to make the form used to register a vehicle as a medium speed vehicle available electronically on its website. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, authorizes department of revenue to make the form used to register a vehicle as a medium speed vehicle available electronically on its website. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Rep. John Windle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2471 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation & Safety Committee